MN HF3692 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's museums improvements funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Children's museums improvements funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Frederick [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Demuth |
2022-03-24 | House | Authors added Theis and Akland |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Wolgamott and Poston |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Olson, L.; and Schultz |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3577 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Author added Putnam