MN HF3689 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farmers who received mediation notice exempted from MinnesotaCare income limit, and money appropriated.
Title
Farmers who received mediation notice exempted from MinnesotaCare income limit, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Poston |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Persell |
2020-03-09 | House | Authors added Pinto, Halverson, Morrison, and Kunesh-Podein |
2020-03-04 | House | Authors added Huot and Brand |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3576 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy