MN HF3678 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income and asset exclusion expiration date extended for public assistance program eligibility as part of the income and child development in the first three years of life demonstration project.
Title
Income and asset exclusion expiration date extended for public assistance program eligibility as part of the income and child development in the first three years of life demonstration project.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-28 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3579 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy