MN HF3677 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational therapy; clarifying, technical, and conforming changes made.
Title
Occupational therapy; clarifying, technical, and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Edelson |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3365 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Author added Benson