MN HF3658 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author stricken Grossell
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author stricken Grossell
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Quality public education for all children provided as a fundamental right, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Quality public education for all children provided as a fundamental right, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Author stricken Grossell |
2020-03-11 | House | Author stricken Koznick |
2020-03-09 | House | Authors stricken Dettmer and Swedzinski |
2020-03-05 | House | Author stricken Boe |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3977 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Author stricken Pratt