MN HF3657 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Natural resources; various provisions modified relating to fish diseases, wild rice, school trust land reporting, insecticide use, invasive species permits, game and fish licenses after convictions, and hunting and fishing provisions.
Title
Natural resources; various provisions modified relating to fish diseases, wild rice, school trust land reporting, insecticide use, invasive species permits, game and fish licenses after convictions, and hunting and fishing provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] |
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Anne Claflin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Claflin |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-02-24 | House | Authors added Lee, Ecklund, Wagenius, Sundin, and Gunther |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3842 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Author added Ingebrigtsen