MN HF365 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspicious activity in voter registration or absentee ballot application investigation requirements modified, permitted persons to mail or deliver absentee ballots on behalf of voter specified, criminal penalty established, and voter fraud penalty assessment established.
Title
Suspicious activity in voter registration or absentee ballot application investigation requirements modified, permitted persons to mail or deliver absentee ballots on behalf of voter specified, criminal penalty established, and voter fraud penalty assessment established.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF716 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections