MN HF3649 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authors added Jurgens and Bliss
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authors added Jurgens and Bliss
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution memorializing Congress propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
A resolution memorializing Congress propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Patricia Mueller [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Jurgens and Bliss |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Grossell |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF3208 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections