MN HF3645 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parent's Bill of Rights created.
Title
Parent's Bill of Rights created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Backer |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Heintzeman and Mekeland |
2020-02-24 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Runbeck, Erickson, and Munson |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3513 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy