MN HF3629 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Frazier
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Frazier
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homestead market value exclusion modified.
Title
Homestead market value exclusion modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Frazier |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3192 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Author added Putnam