MN HF3625 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modular home definition modified, and assessment provision modified for manufactured home relocation trust fund.
Title
Modular home definition modified, and assessment provision modified for manufactured home relocation trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-13 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3443 |
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3443 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed