MN HF3616 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Baker
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Baker
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grand Portage; tourism industry recovery grant program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Grand Portage; tourism industry recovery grant program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Baker |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Lislegard, Bliss, Sundin, Lippert, Marquart and Lee |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2769 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance