MN HF3611 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; enrollee's contribution toward out-of-pocket maximum or cost sharing calculation requirements set.
Title
Insurance; enrollee's contribution toward out-of-pocket maximum or cost sharing calculation requirements set.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2136 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Authors added Rest; Klein