MN HF3610 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Penalty for assaulting a police officer enhanced, and dissemination of personal information about law enforcement officials criminalized.
Title
Penalty for assaulting a police officer enhanced, and dissemination of personal information about law enforcement officials criminalized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 101 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Taken from table |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 101-24 |
2018-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-05-16 | House | Amended |
2018-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Lohmer. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3292 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy