MN HF360 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Custody and parenting time presumptions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody and parenting time presumptions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseAuthor added Heinrich
2021-02-15HouseAuthor added Munson
2021-02-10HouseAuthor added Mortensen
2021-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF1240 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Author added Rosen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback