MN HF3599 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Victim notice and input in end-of-confinement review process provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victim notice and input in end-of-confinement review process provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseSecond reading
2024-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt, place on General Register, with further rec to place on Consent Calendar
2024-02-22HouseAuthor added Curran
2024-02-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF4093 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Author added Gustafson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback