MN HF359 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Flame-retardant chemical use in certain products prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flame-retardant chemical use in certain products prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Claflin
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Noor
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-04HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce
2019-03-04HouseAuthors added Halverson and Lippert
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Persell.
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Lillie, Schultz
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Loeffler, Freiberg, Hansen, Long, Murphy, Pinto, Youakim, Dehn, and Bierman
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF321 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback