MN HF3587 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Labor and Industry Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Labor and Industry Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employers required to disclose salary ranges in job postings.
Title
Employers required to disclose salary ranges in job postings.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Jordan |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Hussein |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3725 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha