MN HF3587 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full-service community school funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Full-service community school funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Greenman |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Jordan |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3233 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy