MN HF3587 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonexclusionary pupil disciplinary policies and practices provided, and report required.
Title
Nonexclusionary pupil disciplinary policies and practices provided, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Drew Christensen [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Moran. |
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-21 | House | Authors added Christensen and Theis. |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added West. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2920 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Referred to E-12 Policy