MN HF3570 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance coverage of health home services modified.
Title
Medical assistance coverage of health home services modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Schultz |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3424 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy