MN HF357 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnancy accommodations applicability expanded.
Title
Pregnancy accommodations applicability expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Edelson and Jordan |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1180 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy