MN HF357 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Author added Dehn, R.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Author added Dehn, R.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General assistance eligibility expanded.
Title
General assistance eligibility expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-01-23 | House | Authors added Moran, Clark, and Lee. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF791 (Similar To) 2017-02-09 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy