MN HF3569 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Author added Novotny
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health services outdoor activities for law enforcement officers, firefighters, and emergency medical services personnel funding provided; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health services outdoor activities for law enforcement officers, firefighters, and emergency medical services personnel funding provided; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21HouseAuthor added Novotny
2024-02-19HouseAuthor added Anderson, P. E.
2024-02-14HouseAuthor added Norris
2024-02-13HouseAuthor added Curran
2024-02-12HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF4377 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Author added Nelson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback