MN HF3568 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental illness decriminalization planning group provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Mental illness decriminalization planning group provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Poston |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Corrections Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Lillie |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4439 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy