MN HF3554 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aggravated first-degree witness tampering included in definitions of violent crime and crimes against a person.
Title
Aggravated first-degree witness tampering included in definitions of violent crime and crimes against a person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Second reading |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3709 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Second reading