MN HF3554 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative teacher preparation program grant eligibility modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Alternative teacher preparation program grant eligibility modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Moller |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3229 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance and Policy