MN HF3552 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin County Medical Center addiction medicine graduate medical education fellowship program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Hennepin County Medical Center addiction medicine graduate medical education fellowship program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Author added Morrison |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Baker |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3424 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Author added Clausen