MN HF3551 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal tax exclusion conformed to from restaurant revitalization grant gross income.
Title
Federal tax exclusion conformed to from restaurant revitalization grant gross income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3090 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Author added Dziedzic