MN HF3547 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle registration tax determination amended.
Title
Motor vehicle registration tax determination amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3497 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes