MN HF3546 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Winkler
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Winkler
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Norway House expansion and renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Norway House expansion and renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Winkler |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Albright, Lee, Moran, Her, Huot, Lillie and Urdahl |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2962 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Author added Clausen