MN HF3545 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Horse racing breeder fund use provided.
Title
Horse racing breeder fund use provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 101 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 101 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Secretary of State Chapter 52 | |
2022-05-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-03 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2950 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2950, now on General Orders |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third reading |
2022-03-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-14 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Masin |
2022-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2950 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3545