MN HF3542 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Nornes and Murphy, E.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Nornes and Murphy, E.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community action grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Community action grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
Rep. Clark Johnson [D] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Nornes and Murphy, E. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Poppe. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Marquart. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3050 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Authors added Hoffman; Weber