MN HF354 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Beyond Opioids Project public television and community radio funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Beyond Opioids Project public television and community radio funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Kiel |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Albright |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF441 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections