MN HF3535 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Co-payments for prescription drugs limited.
Title
Co-payments for prescription drugs limited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Munson as chief author. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2674 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Author added Johnson