MN HF353 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public television station equipment grants funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public television station equipment grants funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
2019-02-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Layman
2019-01-24HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF440 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback