MN HF353 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public television station equipment grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Public television station equipment grants funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF440 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment