MN HF3515 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farmers' Legal Action Group grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Farmers' Legal Action Group grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Bly |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3210 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance