MN HF3510 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians; family and child services building funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians; family and child services building funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Kunesh-Podein, Lee, and Moran |
2020-03-11 | House | Authors added Marquart, Layman, Kiel, Kresha, and Erickson |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Persell |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3615 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy