MN HF351 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer protection provided, disclosure of genetically engineered food required, and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer protection provided, disclosure of genetically engineered food required, and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-23HouseAuthor added Hornstein.
2015-02-16HouseAuthor added Mariani.
2015-02-12HouseAuthors added Moran, Schultz, and Carlson.
2015-02-02HouseAuthor added Masin.
2015-01-29HouseAuthors added Fischer, Allen, Loeffler, Newton, Laine, Slocum, Kahn, and Bly.
2015-01-26HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF335 (Similar To) 2015-02-09 - Author added Hayden

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback