MN HF3508 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State land transfer fee provisions modified, land added to state parks, state land sales and conveyances authorized, Upper Sioux Agency State Park deauthorized, and money appropriated.
Title
State land transfer fee provisions modified, land added to state parks, state land sales and conveyances authorized, Upper Sioux Agency State Park deauthorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-04-15 | House | Third reading |
2024-04-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3907 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy