MN HF350 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Student participation in athletic teams restricted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student participation in athletic teams restricted.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseAuthor added Bahr
2021-02-25HouseAuthor added Lucero
2021-02-08HouseAuthors added Heinrich, Dettmer
2021-02-04HouseAuthor added Daniels
2021-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF96 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback