MN HF350 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education; formula allowance increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; formula allowance increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13HouseAuthor added Fischer.
2015-03-02HouseAuthor added Halverson.
2015-02-23HouseAuthor added Barrett.
2015-02-05HouseAuthors added Applebaum and Lien.
2015-01-29HouseAuthors added Ward and Slocum.
2015-01-26HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF163 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Referred to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback