MN HF350 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Special service district and housing improvement district deadlines repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special service district and housing improvement district deadlines repealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-05HouseReferred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
2013-02-25HouseCommittee report, to pass and re-refer to Taxes
2013-02-13HouseAuthors added Bernardy and Laine
2013-02-13HouseCommittee report, to pass and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy
2013-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback