MN HF3498 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School zone speed limits amended.
Title
School zone speed limits amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4377 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy