MN HF3475 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minority business development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minority business development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Agbaje and Davnie |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3639 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Author added Lopez Franzen