MN HF3467 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of transportation authorized to convey property for and promote the use of passenger rail services.
Title
Commissioner of transportation authorized to convey property for and promote the use of passenger rail services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Second reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3961 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Transportation