MN HF3464 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Layman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Layman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charitable contribution subtraction for taxpayers who do not itemize modified.
Title
Charitable contribution subtraction for taxpayers who do not itemize modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Author added Layman. |
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Lohmer. |
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Rosenthal. |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Murphy, E., and Schultz. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Wills. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Albright. |
2018-03-21 | House | Authors added Christensen and Haley. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Masin. |
2018-03-14 | House | Authors added Marquart and Loeffler. |
2018-03-12 | House | Authors added McDonald, Garofalo, Allen, Gruenhagen, and Loon. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3777 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Referred to Taxes