MN HF346 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm transfer to persons ineligible to possess firearm penalties increased.
Title
Firearm transfer to persons ineligible to possess firearm penalties increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Robbins |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Haley |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1183 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy