MN HF3449 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; Native American Community Clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; Native American Community Clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Moran |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3288 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Capital Investment